Compass Bank

Status:Inactive as of 1998-10-23
 Merger - Without Assistance
Successor Bank:BBVA USA
Headquarters:Compass Bank
24 Greenway Plaza
Houston, TX 77046
Established:1988-12-19
FDIC Insurance:1988-12-19
FDIC Cert:#27419
Charter Class:Commercial bank, state charter and Fed member, supervised by the Federal Reserve (FRB)
# of Branches:127
Total Assets:$6,894,017,000
Total Deposits:$5,363,219,000

History

1988-12-19Institution established: Original name:Compass Bank
1988-12-19Acquired First National Bank of Crosby (26910) in CROSBY, TX
1988-12-19Acquired Compass Bank Houston, National Association (24304) in HOUSTON, TX
1990-05-24Acquired Memorial Bank, National Association (24896) in HOUSTON, TX
1990-09-28Changed name to Compass Bank-Houston
1991-12-12Acquired Ameriway Bank National Association (22247) in HOUSTON, TX
1992-06-18Acquired Interstate Bank North (26355) in HOUSTON, TX
1992-11-19Acquired River Oaks Bank (16542) in HOUSTON, TX
1993-11-03Reorganized.
1993-11-03Acquired Spring National Bank (26233) in SPRING, TX
1994-05-05Acquired Security Bank, National Association (26419) in HOUSTON, TX
1996-04-19Acquired Post Oak Bank (18985) in HOUSTON, TX
1996-06-17Changed name to Compass Bank
1996-06-17Acquired Compass Bank-Dallas (32700) in DALLAS, TX
1996-06-17Acquired Compass Bank-San Antonio (15796) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
1996-07-16Acquired Compass Bank-Central Texas (3101) in BELTON, TX
1996-09-27Acquired Texas American Bank (26357) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
1996-09-30Acquired The Royall National Bank of Palestine (23081) in PALESTINE, TX
1996-10-24Acquired ProBank (24981) in THE WOODLANDS, TX
1997-03-12Acquired Horizon Bank & Trust, SSB (32373) in AUSTIN, TX
1997-04-17Acquired Commerce National Bank (23334) in COLLEGE STATION, TX
1997-05-09Acquired River Oaks Trust Company (25802) in HOUSTON, TX
1997-07-14Acquired The Texas National Bank of Waco (5573) in WACO, TX
1997-10-06Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
1998-01-30Acquired WEST UNIVERSITY BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (22225) in HOUSTON, TX
1998-02-06Acquired Fidelity Bank, National Association (24943) in UNIVERSITY PARK, TX
1998-08-01Acquired Hill Country Bank (27492) in AUSTIN, TX
1998-10-23Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Compass Bank (19048) in BIRMINGHAM, AL
1999-08-26Acquired Arizona Bank (18775) in TUCSON, AZ
1999-10-21Acquired Hartland Bank, National Association (24189) in AUSTIN, TX
2000-01-14Acquired Western Bank (20444) in ALBUQUERQUE, NM
2000-04-04Acquired COMPASS BANK-CO (24899) in ENGLEWOOD, CO
2000-07-18Acquired Founders Bank of Arizona (26739) in SCOTTSDALE, AZ
2001-01-05Acquired FirsTier Bank (21690) in NORTHGLENN, CO
2001-01-05Acquired Firstate Bank (17994) in KIMBALL, NE
2006-03-25Acquired TexasBank (15832) in FORT WORTH, TX
2008-03-13Acquired Texas State Bank (23346) in MCALLEN, TX
2008-03-13Acquired The Laredo National Bank (3297) in LAREDO, TX
2008-03-13Acquired State National Bank (34336) in FORT WORTH, TX
2009-08-21Acquired Guaranty Bank (32618) in AUSTIN, TX as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-09-11Acquired BBVA Bancomer USA (18255) in DIAMOND BAR, CA
2009-09-11Acquired Central Bank of the South (20024) in ANNISTON, AL
2019-06-10Changed name to BBVA USA (19048)

Financial Information (1997-12-31 and Older)