Columbia State Bank, History

The following are major historical events for Columbia State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1993-08-16Institution established: Original name:Columbia State Bank
1993-08-16Acquired Columbia National Bank (21308) in LONGVIEW, WA
1994-03-11Acquired Columbia Savings Bank, A Federal Savings Bank (28310) in BELLEVUE, WA
1997-12-02Acquired Bank of Fife (33632) in FIFE, WA
1997-12-02Acquired Cascade Community Bank (32977) in AUBURN, WA
2007-07-23Acquired Mt. Rainier National Bank (32996) in ENUMCLAW, WA
2007-07-23Acquired Town Center Bank (34469) in PORTLAND, OR
2008-04-01Acquired Bank of Astoria (19877) in ASTORIA, OR
2010-01-22Acquired Columbia River Bank (22469) in THE DALLES, OR as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-01-29Acquired American Marine Bank (16730) in BAINBRIDGE ISLAND, WA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-02-01Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
2011-05-20Acquired Summit Bank (513) in BURLINGTON, WA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-05-27Acquired First Heritage Bank (23626) in SNOHOMISH, WA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-08-05Acquired Bank of Whitman (22528) in COLFAX, WA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2013-04-01Acquired West Coast Bank (2345) in LAKE OSWEGO, OR
2014-11-01Acquired Panhandle State Bank (23415) in SANDPOINT, ID
2017-11-01Acquired Pacific Continental Bank (20774) in EUGENE, OR
2021-10-01Acquired Merchants Bank of CommerceColumbia State Bank (24074) in Sacramento, CA.