Charter Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 08/26/2022 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | Nicolet National Bank |
Headquarters: | Charter Bank 1010 W Clairemont Ave Eau Claire, WI 54701 |
Established: | 06/19/1980 |
FDIC Insurance: | 06/19/1980 |
FDIC Cert: | #23137 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed member, supervised by the Federal Reserve (FRB) |
Total Assets: | $1,135,126,000 |
Total Deposits: | $879,016,000 |
History
1980-06-19 | Institution established: Original name:Charter Bank Eau Claire | |
2015-10-01 | Changed name to Charter Bank | |
2015-10-01 | Acquired Community Bank Corporation (35370) in CHASKA, MN | |
2017-09-05 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2017-09-05 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD |