Central Bank of Lake of the Ozarks, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Central Bank of Lake of the Ozarks, including mergers and acquisitions.

1906-09-27Institution established: Original name:Bank of Brumley
1960-07-01Changed name to BANK OF THE LAKE OF THE OZARKS
1971-06-14Moved bank headquarters from LAKE OZARK, MO to MILLER COUNTY, MO
1981-07-22Moved bank headquarters from MILLER COUNTY, MO to OSAGE BEACH, MO
1986-12-29Reorganized.
1988-08-05Acquired Camden County Bank (1055) in CAMDENTON, MO
1989-10-26Changed name to Central Bank of Lake of the Ozarks
2014-01-15Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
2014-01-15Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
2017-07-15Acquired Bank Star One (18124) in FULTON, MO