Central Bank of Audrain County
Status: | Inactive as of 10/01/2021 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | The Central Trust Bank |
Headquarters: | Central Bank of Audrain County 203 East Liberty Street Mexico, MO 65265 |
Established: | 01/03/1883 |
FDIC Insurance: | 01/01/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #4551 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed member, supervised by the Federal Reserve (FRB) |
Total Assets: | $224,979,000 |
Total Deposits: | $199,799,000 |
History
1883-01-03 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Mexico | |
1994-10-01 | Changed name to The First National Bank of Audrain County | |
1994-10-01 | Acquired Laddonia State Bank (8590) in MEXICO, MO | |
2014-07-26 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2014-07-26 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2014-07-26 | Changed name to Central Bank of Audrain County | |
2021-10-01 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Central Trust Bank (12633) |