Centennial Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 07/01/2020 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | Happy State Bank |
Headquarters: | Centennial Bank 904 Avenue O Lubbock, TX 79401 |
Established: | 06/07/1934 |
FDIC Insurance: | 07/10/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #14562 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember, supervised by the FDIC |
Total Assets: | $874,002,000 |
Total Deposits: | $786,146,000 |
History
1934-06-07 | Institution established: Original name:Hale County State Bank | |
1987-02-26 | Acquired Farmers State Bank (17947) in HART, TX | |
1994-05-28 | Acquired First State Bank (18697) in TULIA, TX | |
1998-06-11 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2003-12-02 | Changed name to HCSB | |
2013-01-19 | Changed name to Centennial Bank | |
2013-01-19 | Acquired Citizens Bank (15591) in SLATON, TX | |
2013-09-03 | Moved bank headquarters from PLAINVIEW, TX to LUBBOCK, TX | |
2019-03-05 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2019-03-05 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2020-07-01 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Happy State Bank (10359) in HAPPY, TX | |
2021-02-19 | Acquired First Bank of MuleshoeHappy State Bank (17474) in MULESHOE, TX. | |
2021-06-04 | Acquired The First National Bank of TahokaHappy State Bank (5546) in TAHOKA, TX. |