Home > BMO Harris Bank > History

BMO Harris Bank, History

The following are major historical events for BMO Harris Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1947-05-17Institution established: Original name:Glencoe National Bank
1985-03-01Changed name to Harris Bank Glencoe-Northbrook, National Association
2005-05-27Moved bank headquarters from GLENCOE, IL to CHICAGO, IL
2005-05-27Changed name to Harris National Association
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Barrington, National Association (3604) in BARRINGTON, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Trust and Savings Bank (906) in CHICAGO, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Woodstock (1785) in WOODSTOCK, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Oakbrook Terrace (20807) in OAKBROOK TERRACE, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Westchester (19107) in WESTCHESTER, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Naperville (17728) in NAPERVILLE, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank St. Charles (13246) in SAINT CHARLES, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Marengo (1813) in MARENGO, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Libertyville (32959) in LIBERTYVILLE, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Huntley (1783) in HUNTLEY, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Hoffman-Schaumburg (19974) in HOFFMAN ESTATES, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Frankfort (10814) in FRANKFORT, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Bartlett (9073) in BARTLETT, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Cary-Grove (5742) in CARY, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Suburban Bank of Barrington (19855) in BARRINGTON, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Arlington-Meadows (18106) in ROLLING MEADOWS, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Argo (17321) in SUMMIT, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Winnetka, National Association (9275) in WINNETKA, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Palatine, National Association (16204) in PALATINE, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Wilmette, National Association (21206) in WILMETTE, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Joliet, National Association (3685) in JOLIET, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Elk Grove, National Association (20544) in ELK GROVE VILLAGE, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Hinsdale, National Association (3679) in HINSDALE, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Batavia, National Association (3605) in BATAVIA, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank Aurora, National Association (18401) in AURORA, IL
2005-05-27Acquired Harris Bank West, National Association (16624) in ROSELLE, IL
2005-12-02Acquired Villa Park Trust & Savings Bank (10441) in VILLA PARK, IL
2006-02-17Acquired NLSB (10451) in PLAINFIELD, IL
2006-08-25Acquired Mercantile National Bank of Indiana (9282) in HAMMOND, IN
2007-05-12Acquired First National Bank & Trust (16298) in KOKOMO, IN
2008-09-06Acquired Ozaukee Bank National Association (22017) in CEDARBURG, WI
2008-09-06Acquired Lincoln State Bank (13028) in MILWAUKEE, WI
2010-04-23Acquired Amcore Bank, National Association (3735) in ROCKFORD, IL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-05Acquired The Harris Bank National Association (24960) in SCOTTSDALE, AZ
2011-07-05Acquired M & I Bank NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (28923) in LAS VEGAS, NV
2011-07-05Acquired M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank (1020) in MILWAUKEE, WI
2011-07-05Changed name to BMO Harris Bank National Association
2012-02-07Reorganized.
2012-02-09Reorganized.
2012-04-20Reorganized.
2012-05-01Reorganized.
2012-06-01Reorganized.
2012-07-01Reorganized.
2012-08-01Reorganized.
2012-09-01Acquired M&I National Trust Company (34833) in MILWAUKEE, WI
2012-09-04Reorganized.