Home > Blackhawk Bank > History

Blackhawk Bank, History

The following are major historical events for Blackhawk Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1881-01-01Institution established: Original name:Beloit Savings Bank
1990-05-16Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK
1990-05-16Changed name to Blackhawk State Bank
1998-03-31Acquired Blackhawk State Bank, S.B. (31195) in ROCHELLE, IL
1998-09-03Acquired First Federal Savings Bank (29397) in BELVIDERE, IL
2003-10-01Acquired First Bank, bc (16551) in CAPRON, IL
2011-07-01Changed name to Blackhawk Bank
2013-04-24Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED
2019-07-19Acquired The First National Bank of McHenry (20081) in MCHENRY, IL