Beal Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Beal Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1988-03-10 | Institution established: Original name:Beal Savings Banc | |
1992-10-13 | Moved bank headquarters from CARROLLTON, TX to DALLAS, TX | |
1992-12-17 | Changed name to Beal Banc, Savings Association | |
1994-12-01 | Changed name to Beal Bank, s.s.b. | |
1994-12-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1994-12-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2001-02-20 | Moved bank headquarters from DALLAS, TX to PLANO, TX | |
2003-02-07 | Acquired Southern Pacific Bank (27094) in TORRANCE, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2005-05-26 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2008-02-04 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION | |
2008-02-04 | Changed institution class to OCC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANKS | |
2008-02-04 | Changed name to Beal Bank | |
2009-12-18 | Acquired New South Federal Savings Bank (32276) in IRONDALE, AL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-01-31 | Changed institution class to FDIC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANK | |
2010-01-31 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2010-01-31 | Changed name to Beal Bank, SSB | |
2011-10-14 | Acquired Charter Bank (59030) in ALBUQUERQUE, NM | |
2020-12-15 | Changed name to Beal Bank. | |
2020-12-15 | Changed Bank Class to NM. | |
2020-12-15 | Changed Organization Type to COMMERCIAL BANK. |