BANKWEST OF KANSAS, History

The following are major historical events for BANKWEST OF KANSAS, including mergers and acquisitions.

1929-01-01Institution established: Original name:The Goodland State Bank in Goodland
1939-04-15Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
1939-04-15Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
1940-06-05Changed name to The Goodland State Bank, in Goodland, Kansas
1945-04-18Changed name to Goodland State Bank
1972-08-14Changed name to Goodland State Bank and Trust Company
1990-01-22Changed name to BankWest
1995-11-04Acquired BankWest (26712) in SAINT FRANCIS, KS
2000-06-21Changed name to BANKWEST OF KANSAS
2000-12-08Acquired The Citizens State Bank (16494) in KEENESBURG, CO