Bank of Southern California, N.A., History

The following are major historical events for Bank of Southern California, N.A., including mergers and acquisitions.

2001-12-18Institution established: Original name:Ramona National Bank
2006-11-15Changed name to First Business Bank, National Association
2008-01-14Moved bank headquarters from RAMONA, CA to SAN DIEGO, CA
2010-12-04Changed name to Bank of Southern California, N.A.
2014-11-07Acquired Frontier Bank, FSB (34738) in PALM DESERT, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2018-07-31Acquired Americas United Bank (58360) in GLENDALE, CA
2020-05-31Acquired Calwest Bank (35069) in RANCHO SANTA MARGARITA, CA
2021-10-01Acquired Bank of Santa ClaritaBank of Southern California, N.A. (57816) in SANTA CLARITA, CA.