American Savings Bank, FSB

Status:Inactive as of 2018-04-14
 Merger - Without Assistance
Successor Bank:Peoples Bank
Headquarters:American Savings Bank, FSB
503 Chillicothe Street
Portsmouth, OH 45662
Established:1892-01-01
FDIC Insurance:1948-12-27
FDIC Cert:#29597
Charter Class:Savings associations, state or federal charter, supervised by the Office of Thrift Supervision (OTS)
# of Branches:6
Total Assets:$285,430,000
Total Deposits:$203,083,000

History

1892-01-01Institution established: Original name:American Savings and Loan Association
1993-07-09Changed name to American Savings Bank
1993-07-09Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK
1995-01-31Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS & LOAN
1995-01-31Changed name to American Savings Association
1995-05-10Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN
1995-07-21Changed name to American Savings Bank, FSB
1995-07-21Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK
2002-06-28Acquired Waverly Building and Loan Company (30093) in WAVERLY, OH
2011-07-21Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
2012-11-16Acquired Cottage Savings Bank (57089) in MONTGOMERY, OH
2018-04-14Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Peoples Bank (6544) in MARIETTA, OH

Financial Information (2018-03-31 and Older)