American Bank & Trust
Participated in Absorption/Consolidation/Merger | |
Headquarters: | American Bank & Trust 6810 S Minnesota Ave Sioux Falls, SD 57108 |
Established: | 01/01/1892 |
FDIC Insurance: | 01/01/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #1117 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember, supervised by the FDIC |
# of Branches: | 19 |
Total Assets: | $1,714,192,000 |
Total Deposits: | $1,515,405,000 |
History
1892-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Alpena | |
1941-06-06 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1941-06-06 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1964-05-02 | Changed name to American State Bank | |
1964-05-02 | Moved bank headquarters from ALPENA, SD to WESSINGTON SPRINGS, SD | |
1994-01-18 | Acquired Farmers State Bank of Mellette (12646) in MELLETTE, SD | |
2000-06-01 | Acquired Hand County State Bank (1128) in MILLER, SD | |
2002-04-01 | Changed name to American Bank & Trust | |
2002-04-12 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2011-10-03 | Acquired Peoples State Bank (9002) in DE SMET, SD | |
2012-12-07 | Acquired Mansfield State Bank (11136) in MANSFIELD, SD | |
2014-05-17 | Acquired American State Bank of Pierre (22554) in PIERRE, SD | |
2018-07-01 | Acquired Farmers State Bank (6080) in STICKNEY, SD |