Home > Union Bank > History
Union Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Union Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1891-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Union Savings Bank and Trust Company of Morrisville, VT. | |
1964-08-20 | Changed name to Union Savings Bank and Trust Company of Morrisville, Vermont | |
1970-01-01 | Changed name to The Union Savings Bank and Trust Company | |
1974-06-13 | Changed name to The Union Bank | |
1983-01-06 | Changed name to Union Bank | |
2003-05-16 | Acquired Citizens Savings Bank and Trust Company (14169) in SAINT JOHNSBURY, VT |