Home > Tri Counties Bank > History
Tri Counties Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Tri Counties Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1975-03-11 | Institution established: Original name:Tri Counties Bank | |
1981-03-27 | Acquired Shasta County Bank (17081) in REDDING, CA | |
1994-07-21 | Acquired Country National Bank (25915) in REDDING, CA | |
1996-10-16 | Acquired Sutter Buttes Savings Bank, F.S.B. (32164) in YUBA CITY, CA | |
2003-04-04 | Acquired North State National Bank (23756) in CHICO, CA | |
2010-05-28 | Acquired Granite Community Bank, N.A. (57315) in GRANITE BAY, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-09-23 | Acquired Citizens Bank of Northern California (33983) in NEVADA CITY, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2014-10-03 | Acquired North Valley Bank (20959) in REDDING, CA | |
2018-07-06 | Acquired First National Bank of Northern California (18767) in DALY CITY, CA |