Home > First Financial Bank > History
First Financial Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Financial Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-04-01 | Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1984-03-31 | Changed name to First Financial Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1988-12-21 | Changed name to First Financial Bank, A Federal Savings Bank | |
1988-12-21 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1999-05-13 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
1999-05-13 | Changed name to First Financial Bank | |
1999-05-13 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
1999-05-13 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2006-05-16 | Acquired Cornerstone Bank (35269) in SENATOBIA, MS | |
2019-11-01 | Acquired The First National Bank of Wynne (3897) in WYNNE, AR |