Home > Comerica Bank > History
Comerica Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Comerica Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1849-03-05 | Institution established: Original name:The Detroit Savings Bank | |
1936-01-14 | Changed name to The Detroit Bank | |
1956-08-31 | Changed name to The Detroit Bank and Trust Company | |
1982-11-15 | Changed name to Comerica Bank-Detroit | |
1984-01-01 | Acquired Bank of the Commonwealth (12894) in DETROIT, MI | |
1988-01-01 | Acquired Comerica Bank-Metro East, National Association (22631) in STERLING HEIGHTS, MI | |
1988-01-01 | Acquired Comerica Bank-Southfield (22008) in SOUTHFIELD, MI | |
1988-01-01 | Acquired Comerica Bank-Metro West, National Association (23077) in NOVI, MI | |
1988-01-01 | Acquired Comerica Bank-Livonia (21772) in LIVONIA, MI | |
1988-01-01 | Acquired Comerica Bank - Grosse Pointe, National Association (24186) in GROSSE POINTE, MI | |
1988-01-01 | Acquired Comerica Bank-Warren, National Association (19651) in WARREN, MI | |
1988-01-01 | Acquired Comerica Bank-Troy (22067) in TROY, MI | |
1989-12-08 | Acquired Dearborn Bank and Trust Company (17256) in DEARBORN, MI | |
1991-05-01 | Changed name to Comerica Bank | |
1991-05-01 | Acquired Comerica Bank National Association (5028) in JACKSON, MI | |
1992-01-01 | Reorganized. | |
1992-09-14 | Acquired Manufacturers Bank, National Association (5020) in DETROIT, MI | |
1995-05-01 | Reorganized. | |
1997-11-14 | Reorganized. | |
1997-12-15 | Reorganized. | |
1998-06-30 | Reorganized. | |
1998-07-01 | Reorganized. | |
1998-12-12 | Acquired Comerica Bank & Trust, Federal Savings Bank (33187) in BOCA RATON, FL | |
1998-12-18 | Reorganized. | |
1998-12-23 | Reorganized. | |
1999-01-11 | Reorganized. | |
1999-09-30 | Reorganized. | |
2000-03-01 | Reorganized. | |
2000-09-15 | Reorganized. | |
2000-09-27 | Reorganized. | |
2001-05-09 | Reorganized. | |
2001-06-01 | Reorganized. | |
2001-12-01 | Reorganized. | |
2001-12-20 | Reorganized. | |
2001-12-28 | Reorganized. | |
2002-07-02 | Reorganized. | |
2003-05-30 | Reorganized. | |
2003-06-30 | Acquired Comerica Bank-California (22894) in SAN JOSE, CA | |
2003-06-30 | Acquired Comerica Bank - Texas (1493) in DALLAS, TX | |
2006-09-12 | Reorganized. | |
2007-09-19 | Reorganized. | |
2007-11-01 | Moved bank headquarters from DETROIT, MI to DALLAS, TX | |
2007-11-01 | Reorganized. | |
2008-06-17 | Reorganized. | |
2010-04-15 | Reorganized. | |
2011-06-03 | Reorganized. | |
2011-06-30 | Reorganized. | |
2011-07-28 | Acquired Sterling Bank (21726) in HOUSTON, TX |