Home > Citizens Bank > History
Citizens Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Citizens Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1904-02-04 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Claude | |
1987-10-26 | Reorganized. | |
2004-08-25 | Acquired Citizens Bank (16681) in TUCUMCARI, NM | |
2004-12-30 | Changed name to Citizens Bank | |
2004-12-30 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2004-12-30 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2014-06-01 | Moved bank headquarters from CLAUDE, TX to AMARILLO, TX |