Home > Citizens Bank > History
Citizens Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Citizens Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1949-07-24 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens State Bank & Trust Company | |
1960-02-16 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1960-02-16 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1972-06-01 | Changed name to Citizens Bank | |
1975-01-10 | Changed name to Allied Citizens Bank | |
1987-11-19 | Changed name to Citizens Bank | |
1988-12-15 | Acquired First National Bank in Center (17654) in CENTER, TX | |
1990-08-30 | Acquired The First National Bank of Levelland (3299) in LEVELLAND, TX | |
1992-09-10 | Acquired The First National Bank of Yorktown (5596) in YORKTOWN, TX | |
1993-02-28 | Acquired New First City, Texas - Kountze, National Association (33722) in KOUNTZE, TX | |
1993-02-28 | Acquired New First City, Texas - Sour Lake, National Association (33730) in SOUR LAKE, TX | |
2018-10-01 | Acquired Gladewater National Bank (23835) in GLADEWATER, TX |