Citizens Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 01/17/2020 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | The Cecilian Bank |
Headquarters: | Citizens Bank 1021 South Main Street Hartford, KY 42347 |
Established: | 01/01/1914 |
FDIC Insurance: | 01/01/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #1051 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed member, supervised by the Federal Reserve (FRB) |
Total Assets: | $120,974,000 |
Total Deposits: | $110,921,000 |
History
1914-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens Bank | |
2020-01-17 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Cecilian Bank (8774) in CECILIA, KY |