Home > Carver Federal Savings Bank > History
Carver Federal Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Carver Federal Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1948-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Carver Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1949-03-07 | Moved bank headquarters from NEW YORK CITY, NY to NEW YORK, NY | |
1982-08-31 | Acquired Allied Federal Savings and Loan Association (31034) in JAMAICA, NY | |
1986-12-31 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1986-12-31 | Changed name to Carver Federal Savings Bank | |
1990-11-16 | Acquired Nassau Savings and Loan Association, F.A. (33031) in BROOKLYN, NY | |
2006-09-29 | Reorganized. | |
2006-09-29 | Acquired Community Capital Bank (33199) in BROOKLYN, NY | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY |