Home > Bank of Bridger > History
Bank of Bridger, History
The following are major historical events for Bank of Bridger, including mergers and acquisitions.
1906-05-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Lovell | |
1988-07-18 | Changed name to Wyoming National Bank Lovell | |
1991-05-06 | Changed name to Norwest Bank Wyoming Lovell, National Association | |
1995-03-08 | Changed name to Bank of Lovell, National Association | |
2004-03-06 | Changed name to Bank of Bridger, National Association | |
2004-03-06 | Acquired Bank of Bridger (15833) in BRIDGER, MT | |
2004-03-06 | Moved bank headquarters from LOVELL, WY to BRIDGER, MT | |
2017-01-20 | Acquired Montana State Bank (2201) in PLENTYWOOD, MT | |
2019-10-04 | Acquired First Security Bank of Malta (20646) in MALTA, MT | |
2019-10-04 | Acquired Valley Bank (27518) in GLASGOW, MT |