Home > Banc of California > History
Banc of California, History
The following are major historical events for Banc of California, including mergers and acquisitions.
1982-08-26 | Institution established: Original name:First Professional Bank, National Association | |
2001-10-08 | Acquired First Charter Bank, National Association (24451) in BEVERLY HILLS, CA | |
2002-01-23 | Changed name to Pacific Western National Bank | |
2002-01-23 | Acquired First Community Bank of the Desert (23232) in INDIAN WELLS, CA | |
2002-01-23 | Acquired Pacific Western National Bank (23263) in PICO RIVERA, CA | |
2002-08-22 | Acquired Upland Bank (25060) in UPLAND, CA | |
2002-08-23 | Acquired Marathon National Bank (24675) in LOS ANGELES, CA | |
2003-08-22 | Acquired Verdugo Banking Company (33483) in GLENDALE, CA | |
2004-04-16 | Acquired Harbor National Bank (24210) in NEWPORT BEACH, CA | |
2005-08-12 | Acquired First American Bank (24308) in ROSEMEAD, CA | |
2005-10-07 | Acquired Pacific Liberty Bank (34817) in HUNTINGTON BEACH, CA | |
2006-01-04 | Acquired Cedars Bank (27069) in LOS ANGELES, CA | |
2006-05-10 | Acquired Foothill Independent Bank (21104) in GLENDORA, CA | |
2006-09-13 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2006-09-13 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2006-09-13 | Changed name to Pacific Western Bank | |
2006-10-26 | Acquired Community National Bank (26426) in ESCONDIDO, CA | |
2006-10-26 | Moved bank headquarters from SANTA MONICA, CA to SAN DIEGO, CA | |
2006-10-26 | Acquired First National Bank (23743) in RANCHO SANTA FE, CA | |
2008-11-07 | Acquired Security Pacific Bank (23595) in LOS ANGELES, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2009-08-28 | Acquired Affinity Bank (27197) in VENTURA, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-08-20 | Acquired Los Padres Bank (32165) in SOLVANG, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-12-20 | Moved bank headquarters from SAN DIEGO, CA to LOS ANGELES, CA | |
2012-08-01 | Acquired American Perspective Bank (58614) in SAN LUIS OBISPO, CA | |
2013-06-01 | Acquired First California Bank (22819) in WESTLAKE VILLAGE, CA | |
2014-04-07 | Acquired CapitalSource Bank (58878) in LOS ANGELES, CA | |
2015-10-07 | Acquired Square 1 Bank (58021) in DURHAM, NC | |
2016-01-09 | Moved bank headquarters from LOS ANGELES, CA to BEVERLY HILLS, CA | |
2017-10-20 | Acquired California United Bank (57904) in LOS ANGELES, CA | |
2019-06-28 | Reorganized. |